Docket for 16-994
No. 16-994 | |
Title: |
CSB-System International, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Michelle K. Lee, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office |
|
Docketed: | February 15, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1832) |
Decision Date: | August 9, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 15, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 13 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2017) |
Mar 6 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondent Michelle K. Lee, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed. |
Mar 8 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017. |
Mar 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|