Docket for 16-7405
No. 16-7405 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Bigler Jobe Stouffer, II, Petitioner |
v. |
Terry Royal, Warden |
|
Docketed: | January 4, 2017 |
Linked with 16A369 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-6211) |
Decision Date: | June 17, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 2, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 5 2016 |
Application (16A369) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 31, 2016 to December 30, 2016, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Oct 14 2016 |
Application (16A369) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 30, 2016. |
Dec 30 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 3, 2017) |
Feb 3 2017 |
Brief of respondent Terry Royal, Warden in opposition filed. |
Feb 8 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Bigler Jobe Stouffer, II filed. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|