~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 9 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 12, 2016) |
Dec 12 2016 |
Brief of respondent PNC Financial Services Group, Incorporated in opposition filed. |
Dec 22 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Keith Alexander Ashe filed. |
Dec 29 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017. |
Jan 17 2017 |
The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until February 7, 2017, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
Feb 7 2017 |
Petitioner complied with order of January 17, 2017. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |