Docket for 16-6208
No. 16-6208 | |
Title: |
Tyris Lamar Franklin, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | September 27, 2016 |
Linked with 16A169 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S217699) |
Decision Date: | May 26, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 12 2016 |
Application (16A169) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 24, 2016 to September 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Aug 16 2016 |
Application (16A169) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 23, 2016. |
Sep 23 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 27, 2016) |
Nov 16 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016. |
Dec 5 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|