~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 30 2016 |
Application (16A13) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 17, 2016 to August 22, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jul 14 2016 |
Application (16A13) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 22, 2016. |
Aug 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 23, 2016) |
Sep 23 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 24, 2016. |
Oct 5 2016 |
Brief of respondents Grantt Culliver, Superintendent, Holman Correctional Facility, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 19 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Michael Shannon Taylor filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 4, 2016. |
Oct 25 2016 |
Record Requested . |
Oct 31 2016 |
Record received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit (1 envelope). |
Nov 7 2016 |
Record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Alabama (3 boxes). |
Nov 8 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. |
Nov 28 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
Dec 23 2016 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Jan 3 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017. |
Jan 23 2017 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
Jul 21 2017 |
Record returned to the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit (1 envelope). |
Jul 21 2017 |
Record returned to the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Alabama (3 boxes). |