Docket for 16-289
No. 16-289 | |
Vide 16-296 | |
Title: |
Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Epic Pharma, LLC, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 6, 2016 |
Linked with 16A8 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2014-1294, 2014-1296, 2014-1306, -1307, 2014-1311, -1312, -1313, -1314) |
Decision Date: | February 1, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 4, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 29 2016 |
Application (16A8) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 2, 2016 to September 1, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jun 30 2016 |
Application (16A8) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 1, 2016. |
Sep 1 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 6, 2016) |
Sep 29 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondents Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. & Mylan, Inc. to respond filed. |
Oct 4 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Professor Richard E. Kouri, Ph.d. filed. |
Oct 25 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2016. |
Nov 14 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|