Docket for 16-205
No. 16-205 | |
Title: |
Pactiv LLC, Petitioner |
v. |
Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office |
|
Docketed: | August 15, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1164 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1457, 2015, 1458) |
Decision Date: | March 16, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 10 2016 |
Application (15A1164) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 14, 2016 to August 12, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
May 11 2016 |
Application (15A1164) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 12, 2016. |
Aug 12 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2016) |
Sep 2 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed. |
Sep 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Sep 12 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law association of Chicago filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 14 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Raymond A. Mercado filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Paul W. Hughes |
Mayer Brown LLP | (202)-263-3147 |
Counsel of Record | 1999 K Street NW | |
| Washington, DC 20006-1101 | |
| phughes@mayerbrown.com |
Party name: Pactiv LLC |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Ian Heath Gershengorn |
Acting Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record |
United States Department of Justice | |
| 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20530-0001 | |
| SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov |
Party name: Michelle K. Lee, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office |
Other: | | |
Donald William Rupert |
Marshall, Gerstein & Borun, LLP | (312) 474-6300 |
|
233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 6300 | |
| Chicago, IL 60606 | |
| drupert@marshallip.com |
Party name: Intellectual Property Law association of Chicago |
| | |
Andrew Wayne Williams |
McDonnell, Boehnen, Hulbert &Berghoff, LLP | 312-913-0001 |
|
300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3200 | |
| Chicago, IL 60606 | |
| williams@mbhb.com |
Party name: Raymond A. Mercado |