~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 24 2016 |
Application (15A1300) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2016 to August 10, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jun 28 2016 |
Application (15A1300) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 10, 2016. |
Aug 10 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 12, 2016) |
Aug 31 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondents Alfonso Cioffi, et al. to respond filed. |
Sep 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Sep 7 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Public Knowledge, et al. (Distributed) |
Sep 9 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of Internet Association, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 12 2016 |
Response Requested . (Due October 12, 2016) |
Oct 7 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 14, 2016. |
Nov 14 2016 |
Brief of respondents Alfonso Cioffi, et al. in opposition filed. |
Nov 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Nov 30 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Google, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 9 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Public Knowledge, et al. GRANTED. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |