Docket for 16-1046
No. 16-1046 | |
Title: |
Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, Petitioner |
v. |
DIRECTTV, LLC, et al. |
|
Docketed: | March 1, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1845, 2015-1846, 2015-1847, 2015-1848) |
Decision Date: | September 23, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 30, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2017) |
Mar 17 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondents MLB Advanced Media, Inc. and MLB Advanced Media, L. P. to respond filed. |
Mar 17 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondents DIRECTTV, LLC and DIRECTV Digital, LLC to respond filed. |
Mar 20 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondents NBA Media Ventures, LLC; Turner Digital Basketball Services, Inc.; NHL Interactive Cyber Enterprises, LLC; NHL Enterprises, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P. to respond filed. |
Mar 28 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017. |
Apr 17 2017 |
Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice and Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|