Docket for 15-974
No. 15-974 | |
Title: |
Joao Bock Transaction Systems, LLC, Petitioner |
v. |
Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | February 1, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-1245) |
Decision Date: | October 13, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2016) |
Feb 22 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. to respond filed. |
Mar 2 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Mar 21 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|