Docket for 15-85
No. 15-85 | |
Title: |
Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., et al., Petitioners |
v. |
NuVasive, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | July 20, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2013-1576, 2013-1577) |
Decision Date: | March 2, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 20, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 17 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2015) |
Aug 19 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent NuVasive, Inc. to respond filed. |
Sep 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Sep 14 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due October 14, 2015) |
Oct 13 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2015. |
Nov 10 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 9, 2015. |
Dec 9 2015 |
Brief of respondent NuVasive, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Dec 28 2015 |
Reply of petitioners Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., et al. filed. |
Dec 30 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Jan 19 2016 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Commil USA, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc., 575 U. S. ___ (2015). |
Feb 22 2016 |
Judgment Issued |
|