Docket for 15-736
No. 15-736 | |
Title: |
Alexsam, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
The Gap, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 8, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2014-1564, 2014-1705) |
Decision Date: | June 16, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 8, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 7 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2016) |
Jan 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|