Docket for 15-602
No. 15-602 | |
Title: |
Rodney K. Morgan, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Global Traffic Technologies LLC |
|
Docketed: | November 9, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2014-1537, 2014-1566) |
Decision Date: | June 4, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 7, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 5 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2015) |
Nov 20 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent Global Traffic Technologies LLC to respond filed. |
Dec 9 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|