Docket for 15-592
No. 15-592 | |
Title: |
STC, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Global Traffic Technologies, LLC |
|
Docketed: | November 6, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2014-1537, 2014-1566) |
Decision Date: | June 4, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 7, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 5 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2015) |
Nov 25 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 6, 2016. |
Jan 6 2016 |
Brief of respondent Global Traffic Technologies in opposition filed. |
Jan 19 2016 |
Reply of petitioner STC, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|