Docket for 15-291
No. 15-291 | |
Title: |
Arthrex, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
KFx Medical Corporation |
|
Docketed: | September 9, 2015 |
Linked with 14A1294 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-1372) |
Decision Date: | January 20, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 9, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 23 2015 |
Application (14A1294) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 8, 2015 to September 4, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jun 24 2015 |
Application (14A1294) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 4, 2015. |
Sep 4 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2015) |
Sep 4 2015 |
Appendix of Arthrex, Inc. filed. |
Oct 9 2015 |
Brief of respondent KFx Medical Corporation in opposition filed. |
Oct 27 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Arthrex, Inc. filed. |
Oct 28 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015. |
Nov 16 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|