Docket for 15-1210
No. 15-1210 | |
Title: |
Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Hospira, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | March 28, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1197, 2015-1204, 2015-1259) |
Decision Date: | November 12, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 22, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 27, 2016) |
Apr 27 2016 |
Brief of respondent Hospira, Inc. in opposition filed. |
May 9 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed. |
May 10 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016. |
May 17 2016 |
Letter dated May 17, 2016 from counsel for respondent received calling attention to recent decisions of the United States Patent & Trademark Office's Patent Trial and Appeal Board. (Distributed) |
May 31 2016 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|