Docket for 14-790
No. 14-790 | |
Title: |
Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, fka Morgan Tire & Auto, LLC, Petitioner |
v. |
Milton Brown, et al. |
|
Docketed: | January 7, 2015 |
Linked with 14A498 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S211962) |
Decision Date: | August 27, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 7 2014 |
Application (14A498) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 25, 2014 to January 24, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Nov 10 2014 |
Application (14A498) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 8, 2015. |
Jan 5 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 6, 2015) |
Feb 5 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondents Milton Brown, et al. to respond filed. |
Feb 11 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 27, 2015. |
Feb 11 2015 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, fka Morgan Tire & Auto, LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 24 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due March 26, 2015) |
Mar 17 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 27, 2015. |
Mar 25 2015 |
Brief amici curiae of The Employers Group, et al. filed. |
Apr 27 2015 |
Brief of respondents Milton Brown, et al. in opposition filed. |
May 11 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, fka Morgan Tire & Auto, LLC filed. |
May 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015. |
Jun 1 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|