Docket for 14-702
No. 14-702 | |
Title: |
Andrew U. D. Straw, Petitioner |
v. |
John F. Kloecker, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 16, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-1714) |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 16, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 11 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 15, 2015) |
Dec 11 2014 |
Appendix of Andrew U. D. Straw filed. |
Dec 22 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents John F. Kloecker, et al. to respond filed. |
Dec 30 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2015. |
Jan 20 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|