Docket for 14-615
No. 14-615 | |
Title: |
Carolyn Jones, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as Dean of the University of Iowa College of Law, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Teresa R. Wagner |
|
Docketed: | November 26, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-1650) |
Decision Date: | July 15, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 25, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 24 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 29, 2014) |
Dec 5 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Teresa R. Wagner to respond filed. |
Dec 17 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 5 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due February 4, 2015) |
Feb 4 2015 |
Brief of respondent Teresa R. Wagner in opposition filed. |
Feb 13 2015 |
Reply of petitioners Carolyn Jones, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as Dean of the University of Iowa College of Law, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 18 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 6, 2015. |
Mar 9 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|