Docket for 14-554
No. 14-554 | |
Title: |
Medical Association of Georgia, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
WellPoint, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | November 13, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-14013) |
Decision Date: | June 18, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 15, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 13 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2014) |
Dec 4 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 14, 2015. |
Dec 8 2014 |
Brief amicus curiae of American Medical Association filed. |
Jan 14 2015 |
Brief of respondent WellPoint, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Jan 27 2015 |
Reply of petitioners Medical Association of Georgia, et al. filed. |
Jan 28 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015. |
Feb 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|