Docket for 13-796
No. 13-796 | |
Title: |
LG Electronics, Inc., et al., Petitioners |
v. |
InterDigital Communications, LLC, et al. |
|
Docketed: | January 3, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2012-1628) |
Decision Date: | June 7, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 3, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 31 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2014) |
Jan 28 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 5, 2014, for all respondents. |
Feb 20 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 19, 2014, for all respondents. |
Mar 19 2014 |
Brief of respondent International Trade Commission in opposition filed. |
Mar 19 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents InterDigital Communications, LLC, et al. to respond filed. |
Apr 2 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2014. |
Apr 2 2014 |
Reply of petitioners LG Electronics, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 21 2014 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED with instructions to dismiss the case as moot. See United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36 (1950). |
May 23 2014 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|