Docket for 13-565
No. 13-565 | |
Title: |
Metso Minerals, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Powerscreen International Distribution, Limited, nka Terex GB Limited, et al. |
|
Docketed: | November 7, 2013 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-1572, 2012-1168, 2012-1169) |
Decision Date: | May 14, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 9, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 5 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2013) |
Dec 9 2013 |
Brief of respondents Powerscreen International Distribution, Limited, nka Terex GB Limited, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 23 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Metso Minerals, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 24 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014. |
Jan 13 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|