Docket for 13-1508
No. 13-1508 | |
Title: |
Classen Immunotherapies, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Somaxon Pharmaceuticals |
|
Docketed: | June 19, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2013-1405) |
Decision Date: | January 17, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 21, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 11 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2014) |
Jun 20 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Somaxon Pharmaceuticals to respond filed. |
Jul 2 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|