Docket for 12-514
No. 12-514 | |
Title: |
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Eurand, Inc., nka Aptalis Pharmatech, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 25, 2012 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-1399, 2011-1409) |
Decision Date: | April 16, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 25, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 23 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 26, 2012) |
Nov 1 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2012. |
Nov 2 2012 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs received from either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners. |
Nov 5 2012 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for Par Pharmaceuticals. |
Nov 6 2012 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents. |
Nov 26 2012 |
Brief amicus curiae of Generic Pharmaceutical Association filed. |
Dec 11 2012 |
Brief of respondents Eurand, Inc., nka Aptalis Pharmatech, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 21 2012 |
Reply of petitioners Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al. filed. |
Dec 26 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 11, 2013. |
Jan 14 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |
|