Docket for 12-339
No. 12-339 | |
Title: |
Picture Patents LLC, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Aeropostale, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 19, 2012 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-1558) |
Decision Date: | April 13, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 26, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 17 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2012) |
Oct 18 2012 |
Brief of respondents Aeropostale, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 24 2012 |
Reply of petitioners Picture Patents LLC, et al. filed. |
Oct 29 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 20, 2012. |
Nov 26 2012 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer and Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|