Docket for 12-1372
No. 12-1372 | |
Title: |
Intema Limited, Petitioner |
v. |
PerkinElmer, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | May 20, 2013 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-1577) |
Decision Date: | November 20, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 15, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 16 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2013) |
Jul 10 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |
|