Docket for 12-1228
No. 12-1228 | |
Vide 12-1227 | |
Title: |
Voter Verified, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Election Systems & Software, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | April 10, 2013 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-1559, 2012-1016) |
Decision Date: | November 5, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 10, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 4 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 10, 2013) |
Apr 4 2013 |
Appendix of Voter Verified, Inc. filed. |
May 21 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 6, 2013. |
Jun 10 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |
Jun 29 2013 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Jul 18 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED. |
Aug 12 2013 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|