~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 28 2011 |
Motion (11M60) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed. |
Dec 28 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2012) |
Jan 4 2012 |
MOTION (11M60) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 20, 2012. |
Jan 23 2012 |
Motion (11M60) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted. |
Feb 8 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 23, 2012, for all respondents. |
Mar 6 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 23, 2012, for all respondents. |
Apr 23 2012 |
Brief of respondent Federal Respondent in opposition filed. |
Apr 23 2012 |
Brief of respondents Elpida Memory, Inc, et al. in opposition filed. |
Apr 23 2012 |
Brief of ANP Respondents in opposition filed. (Redacted) |
Apr 23 2012 |
Motion for leave to file brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by ANP Respondents. |
May 7 2012 |
Motion for leave to file reply brief under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by petitioner Tessera, Inc. |
May 7 2012 |
Reply of petitioner Tessera, Inc. filed. (Redacted version) |
May 8 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 24, 2012. |
May 29 2012 |
Motion of ANP Respondents for leave to file brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED. |
May 29 2012 |
Motion for leave to file reply brief under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED. |
May 29 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |