~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 17 2011 |
Application (11A403) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 3, 2011 to January 2, 2012, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Oct 20 2011 |
Application (11A403) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 2, 2012. |
Dec 29 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2012) |
Jan 26 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 5, 2012. |
Feb 23 2012 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National Vaccine Information Center, et al. out of time. |
Mar 5 2012 |
Brief of respondent Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services in opposition filed. |
Mar 19 2012 |
Reply of petitioner Melissa Cloer filed. |
Mar 21 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2012. |
Apr 16 2012 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by National Vaccine Information Center, et al. GRANTED. |
Apr 16 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |