Docket for 11-1397
No. 11-1397 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kevin Chappell, Acting Warden, Petitioner |
v. |
Jesse Edward Gonzales |
|
Docketed: | May 22, 2012 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-99025) |
Decision Date: | December 7, 2011 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 21, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 18 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2012) |
May 18 2012 |
Appendix of Kevin Chappell, Acting Warden filed (Volumes 1 & 2). |
Jun 6 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 20, 2012. |
Jul 19 2012 |
Brief of respondent Jesse Edward Gonzales in opposition filed. |
Jul 19 2012 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent . |
Aug 1 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012. |
Aug 2 2012 |
Reply of petitioner Kevin Chappell, Acting Warden filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 1 2012 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Oct 1 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |
|