Docket for 24A79
|
Jul 22 2024 | Application (24A79) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 23 2024 | Response to application (24A79) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due by noon (EDT) on July 26, 2024. | | | Jul 24 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Statutory Interpretation and Equality Law Scholars filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 25 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Organizations Serving Pregnant and Parenting Students filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 26 2024 | Response to application from respondent Christian Educators Association Int'l; A.C. filed. | | Main Document | Jul 26 2024 | Response to application from respondent Tennessee, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 29 2024 | Reply of applicant Miguel Cardona, et al. filed. | | ReplyProof of Service |
|