SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24A78
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24A78
Title:
Department of Education, et al., Applicants
v.
Louisiana, et al.
Docketed:
July 22, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(24-30399)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2024
Application (24A78) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 23 2024
Response to application (24A78) requested by Justice Alito, due by noon (EDT) on July 26, 2024.
Jul 24 2024
Brief amicus curiae of Statutory Interpretation and Equality Law Scholars filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 25 2024
Brief amicus curiae of Organizations Serving Pregnant and Parenting Students filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 26 2024
Response to application from respondent Rapides Parish School Board filed.
Main Document
Jul 26 2024
Response to application from respondent Louisiana, et al. filed [at 12:09 PM].
Main Document
Proof of Service
Main Document
Jul 29 2024
Reply of applicant Department of Education, et al. filed.
Reply
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Education, , et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga
Counsel of Record
Louisiana Department of Justice
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802
aguinagaj@ag.louisiana.gov
225-506-3746
Party name: Louisiana, Louisiana Department of Education, Mississippi, Montana, Idaho, Webster Parish School Board, Red River Parish School Board, Bossier Parish School Board, Sabine Parish School Board, Grant Parish School Board, West Carroll Parish School Board, Caddo Parish School Board, Natchitoches Parish School Board, Caldwell Parish School Board, Allen Parish School Board, LaSalle Parish School Board, Jefferson Davis Parish School Board, Ouachita Parish School Board, Franklin Parish School Board, Acadia Parish School Board, DeSoto Parish School Board, St. Tammany Parish School Board
John J. Bursch
Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001
jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Rapides Parish School Board
Other
James Patrick Davy
Counsel of Record
All Rise Trial & Appellate
P.O. Box 15216
Philadelphia, PA 19125
jimdavy@allriselaw.org
(215) 792-3579
Party name: ORGANIZATIONS SERVING PREGNANT AND PARENTING STUDENTS
Robert Brian Niles-Weed
Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
767 5th Ave
New York, NY 10153
robert.niles-weed@weil.com
2123108651
Party name: Statutory Interpretation and Equality Law Scholars
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##