Docket for 24A287
|
Sep 19 2024 | Application (24A287) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Sep 23 2024 | Order entered by Justice Alito: Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicants, it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, case No. 23-10520, is hereby administratively stayed pending further order of Justice Alito or of the Court. It is further ordered that a response to the application be filed on or before Monday, September 30, 2024, by 4 p.m. (EDT). | | | Sep 23 2024 | Response of United States to application submitted. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 24 2024 | Amicus brief of Senator Mitch McConnell and Representatives Paul Tonko and Andy Barr submitted. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | Sep 25 2024 | Amicus brief of Shannon Arvin, et al. submitted. | | Main DocumentProof of Service |
|