Docket for 24A11
|
Jul 05 2024 | Application (24A11) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jul 10 2024 | Response to application (24A11) requested by Justice Gorsuch, due by 4 p.m. (EDT), on July 17, 2024. | | | Jul 12 2024 | Letter to the Clerk from applicant Texas, et al., filed. | | Main Document | Jul 15 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute, Kansas Justice Institute, and National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jul 15 2024 | Amicus brief of Counsel for Amici States submitted. | | Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service | Jul 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Senators Mitch McConnel and Bill Cassidy, M.D. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance, Cato Institute, Mackinac Center for Public Policy, and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 17 2024 | Response to application from respondent Department of Education, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service |
|