Docket for 24-88
|
Jul 25 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 05 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents Trustees of Indiana University,et al. filed. | | Main Document | Aug 07 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. | | | Aug 09 2024 | Response Requested. (Due September 9, 2024) | | | Aug 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2024 to October 9, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 27 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 9, 2024. | | | Sep 09 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Profs. Benjamin Edwards, Jayne S. Ressler, Joan Steinman, and Eugene Volokh filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
|