SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Accessibility
What Can I See and Do?
Exhibitions
Activities for Students & Families
Maps & Brochures
Student Group Visits
Etiquette
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-871
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-871
Title:
B. W., a Minor, By Next Friends M. W. and B. W., formerly known herein as Jon AISD Doe, Petitioner
v.
Austin Independent School District
Docketed:
February 13, 2025
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-50158)
Decision Date:
November 13, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2025)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 10 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Austin Independent School District to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 12 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2025.
Mar 17 2025
Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2025
Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 25 2025
Response Requested. (Due April 24, 2025)
Apr 14 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 24, 2025 to May 23, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 15 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2025.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Christopher Blewer Gilbert
Counsel of Record
Thompson & Horton LLP
3200 Southwest Freeway
Suite 2000
Houston, TX 77027
cgilbert@thompsonhorton.com
(832) 868-1663
Party name: Austin Independent School District
Other
Ilya Shapiro
Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017
ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute
William E. Trachman
Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227
wtrachman@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##