Docket for 24-793
 | | No. 24-793
| Title: | Sandwich Isles Communications, Inc., Petitioner v. Hawaiian Telcom Inc., et al. | Docketed: | January 24, 2025 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (23-3520) | Decision Date: | October 22, 2024 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Jan 21 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2025) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 28 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Hawaiian Telcom Inc., et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 05 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. | | | Feb 24 2025 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|