Nov 13 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2024) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 18 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Dec 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. |
| |
Dec 27 2024 | Response Requested. (Due January 27, 2025) |
| |
Dec 30 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2025 to February 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 31 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2025. |
| |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Mar 05 2025 | Reply of petitioner David Asa Villarreal filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 07 2025 | Letter of respondent Texas filed. |
| Main Document |
Mar 12 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2025. |
| |
Mar 31 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/4/2025. |
| |
Apr 07 2025 | Petition GRANTED. |
| |
Apr 08 2025 | Motion of David Asa Villarreal to dispense with joint appendix submitted. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Apr 08 2025 | Motion of David Asa Villarreal for an extension of time submitted. |
| Main Document |