SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-5296
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-5296
Title:
Joseph C. Payne, Petitioner
v.
Merit Systems Protection Board
Docketed:
August 9, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2023-2204)
Decision Date:
July 16, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 9, 2024)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Sep 09 2024
Waiver of right of respondent MSPB to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 12 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph C. Payne
22959 Surry Lane
Millsboro, DE 19966
804-238-2587
Party name: Joseph Payne
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: MSPB
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##