SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-5177
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-5177
Title:
Margaret M. Reed, Petitioner
v.
Department of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:
July 30, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2023-1628)
Decision Date:
February 7, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
April 24, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 29, 2024)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Aug 20 2024
Waiver of right of respondent VA to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 29 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Margaret Reed
Counsel of Record
225 Murcia Dr., #206
Jupiter, FL 33458
(561) 430-1734
Party name: Margaret M. Reed
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: VA
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##