Docket for 24-37
|
May 25 2024 | Application (23A1068) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 10, 2024 to July 10, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | May 30 2024 | Application (23A1068) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 10, 2024. | | | Jul 10 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 15, 2024) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2024 to September 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 09 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2024. | | | Sep 16 2024 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service |
|