SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-297
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-297
Title:
Tamer Mahmoud, et al., Petitioners
v.
Thomas W. Taylor, et al.
Docketed:
September 16, 2024
Linked with 24A94
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-1890)
Decision Date:
May 15, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2024
Application (24A94) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 13, 2024 to September 12, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jul 26 2024
Application (24A94) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 12, 2024.
Sep 12 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2024
Amicus brief of Advancing American Freedom submitted.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric S. Baxter
Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006
ebaxter@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: Tamer Mahmoud, et al.
Other
John Marc Wheat
Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729
MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##