SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-220
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-220
Title:
Christi Jacobsen, Montana Secretary of State, Petitioner
v.
Montana Democratic Party, et al.
Docketed:
August 28, 2024
Linked with 23A1136
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Montana
Case Numbers:
(DA 22-0667)
Decision Date:
March 27, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2024
Application (23A1136) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 25, 2024 to August 24, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jun 24 2024
Application (23A1136) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 24, 2024.
Aug 26 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2024)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 16 2024
Waiver of right of respondent Montana Youth Action, Forward Montana Foundation, and MontPIRG to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 25 2024
Waiver of right of respondent Western Native Voice; Montana Native Vote; Blackfeet Nation; Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes; Fort Belknap Indian Community; and Northern Cheyenne Tribe to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 26 2024
Brief amicus curiae of Restoring Integrity and Trust in Elections filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2024
Waiver of right of respondents Montana Democratic Party, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 27 2024
Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Senatorial Committee filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2024
Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2024
Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601
PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: Christi Jacobsen, Montana Secretary of State
Attorneys for Respondents
Abha Khanna
Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101
AKHANNA@ELIAS.LAW
206-656-0177
Party name: Montana Democratic Party, Mitch Bohn
Theresa Jeane Lee
Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004
tlee@aclu.org
8453236706
Party name: Western Native Voice; Montana Native Vote; Blackfeet Nation; Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes; Fort Belknap Indian Community; and Northern Cheyenne Tribe
Rylee Kate Sommers-Flanagan
Counsel of Record
Upper Seven Law
P.O. Box 31
Helena, MT 59624
rylee@uppersevenlaw.com
4063963373
Party name: Montana Youth Action, Forward Montana Foundation, and MontPIRG
Other
Benjamin Michael Flowers
Counsel of Record
Ashbrook Byrne Kresge LLC
PO Box 8248
Cincinnati, OH 45249
bflowers@ashbrookbk.com
513.201.5775
Party name: Restoring Integrity and Trust in Elections
Christopher E. Mills
Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413
cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: America First Legal Foundation
Erin E. Murphy
Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314
ERIN.MURPHY@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Lanora Christine Pettit
Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548
lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas and Fourteen Additional States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##