SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-180
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-180
Title:
Roku, Inc., Petitioner
v.
International Trade Commission, et al.
Docketed:
August 20, 2024
Linked with 23A1111
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2022-1386)
Decision Date:
January 19, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
April 3, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2024
Application (23A1111) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2024 to August 16, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 17 2024
Application (23A1111) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 16, 2024.
Aug 16 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 19, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 09 2024
Waiver of right of respondent Universal Electronics, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 12 2024
Waiver of right of respondent Federal Respondents to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 25 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Joseph Rizzolo
Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006-6807
matthew.rizzolo@ropesgray.com
202-508-4735
Party name: Roku, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan W Koppelman
Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
51st Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071
ryan.koppelman@alston.com
213-576-1009
Party name: Universal Electronics, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##