Docket for 24-161
|
Jul 11 2024 | Application (24A40) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2024 to September 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jul 16 2024 | Application (24A40) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 23, 2024. | | | Aug 02 2024 | Application (24A138) for a stay, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Aug 08 2024 | Letter to Clerk transmitting parties' stipulation in connection with stay application received. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 10 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 12 2024 | Response to application (24A138) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due by 4pm (EDT), Monday, September 16, 2024. | | | Sep 04 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2024 to October 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 05 2024 | Order entered by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file a response to the application (24A138) to and including October 15, 2024. | | | Sep 05 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 15, 2024. | | | Sep 13 2024 | Amicus brief of TechFreedom and Washington Legal Foundation submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 13 2024 | Amicus brief of Digital Progress Institute submitted. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Sep 13 2024 | Amicus brief of NCTA - The Internet & Television Association submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 13 2024 | Amicus brief of Multicultural Media, Telecom, and Internet Council submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 13 2024 | Amicus brief of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
|