Docket for 24-114
|
Jul 30 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 14 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Intellectual Tech, LLC to respond filed. | | | Sep 11 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. | | | Sep 16 2024 | Response Requested. (Due October 16, 2024) | | |
|