Docket for 23-971
|
Mar 04 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2024) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 05 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 10 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. | | | Apr 10 2024 | Response Requested. (Due May 10, 2024) | | | Apr 30 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2024 to June 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 02 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2024. | | | Jun 10 2024 | Brief of respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 24 2024 | Reply of petitioner Gary Waetzig filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 26 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. | | | Oct 04 2024 | Petition GRANTED. | | |
|