Docket for 23-329
|
Jun 23 2023 | Application (22A1127) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 28, 2023 to September 27, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main Document | Jun 28 2023 | Application (22A1127) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 27, 2023. | | | Sep 26 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 02 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent City of Seattle, Washington to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 04 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. | | | Oct 12 2023 | Response Requested. (Due November 13, 2023) | | | Oct 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2023 to December 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 15, 2023. | | | Oct 19 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 08 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 10 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of GRE Downtowner LLC filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 13 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 13 2023 | Brief amici curiae of National Apartment Association, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 13 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Citizen Action Defense Fund, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 13 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 15 2023 | Brief of respondent City of Seattle, Washington in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 28 2023 | Reply of petitioners Chong Yim, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 03 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024. | | | Jan 22 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|