Docket for 23-138
|
Aug 11 2023 | Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due September 14, 2023) | | Jurisdictional StatementAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 23 2023 | Waiver of right of appellee John Thurston, in His Official Capacity as the Arkansas Secretary of State to respond filed. | | Main Document | Aug 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. | | | Aug 31 2023 | Response Requested. (Due October 2, 2023) | | | Sep 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2023 to November 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 07 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2023. | | | Sep 08 2023 | Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from appellant filed. (Received September 12, 2023) | | Main Document | Nov 01 2023 | Motion to affirm filed by appellee John Thurston, in His Official Capacity as the Arkansas Secretary of State. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 21 2023 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023. | | | May 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024. | | | Jun 03 2024 | Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Alexander v. South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, 602 U. S. ___ (2024). | | | Jul 08 2024 | Judgment Issued. | | Main Document |
|