SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-1324
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-1324
Title:
Thomas Perttu, Petitioner
v.
Kyle Brandon Richards
Docketed:
June 20, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-1298)
Decision Date:
March 19, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 22, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 05 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 22, 2024 to August 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 08 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2024.
Aug 19 2024
Brief of respondent Kyle Richards in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 30 2024
Reply of petitioner Thomas Perttu filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 04 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.
Oct 04 2024
Petition GRANTED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ann Maurine Sherman
Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
G. Mennen Williams Building
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909
SHERMANA@MICHIGAN.GOV
517-335-7628
Party name: Thomas Perttu
Attorneys for Respondent
J. Scott Ballenger
Counsel of Record
Appellate Litigation Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903
JSCOTTBALLENGER@GMAIL.COM
202-701-4925
Party name: Kyle Richards
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##